EP2100133 - DIAGNOSTIC STRIP CODING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/38] | DIAGNOSTIC STRIP CODING SYSTEM AND RELATED METHODS OF USE | ||
[2010/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPRO DIAGNOSTICS, INC. 2400 N.W. 55th Court Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309 / US | [2011/24] |
Former [2010/37] | For all designated states NIPRO DIAGNOSTICS, INC. 2400 N.W. 55th Court Fort Lauderale, FL 33309 / US | ||
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states Home Diagnostics, Inc. 2400 N.W. 55th Court Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEEL, Gary T. 1520 Bluejay Circle Weston, FL 33327 / US | 02 /
MODZELEWSKI, Brent E. 17746 Foxborough Lane Boca Raton, FL 33496 / US | 03 /
CABAN, Allan Javier 6936 Thicket Trace Lakeworth, FL 33467 / US | 04 /
WILL, Adam Mark 1177 Nw 9th Street Boynton Beach, FL 33426 / US | 05 /
OTI, Carlos 915 N.w. 79th Terrace Plantation, FL 33324 / US | 06 /
POPOVICH, Natasha 471 Se 1st Street Terrace Pompano Beach, FL 33060 / US | 07 /
DAVIES, Stephen 5192 Island Club Drive Tamarac, FL 33319 / US | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Molnia, David Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Molnia, David df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/38] | Molnia, David df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07841712.8 | 31.08.2007 | [2009/38] | WO2007US77378 | Priority number, date | US20060594753 | 09.11.2006 Original published format: US 594753 | [2009/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008060740 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2100133 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2100133 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/327 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
G01N33/48771 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00851 (EP,US);
G01N27/3272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Title | German: | DIAGNOSESTREIFENCODIERUNGSSYSTEM | [2010/33] | English: | DIAGNOSTIC STRIP CODING SYSTEM | [2010/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CODAGE DE BANDES DIAGNOSTIQUES | [2010/33] |
Former [2009/38] | DIAGNOSESTREIFENCODIERUNGSSYSTEM UND DAMIT VERBUNDENE VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2009/38] | DIAGNOSTIC STRIP CODING SYSTEM AND RELATED METHODS OF USE | ||
Former [2009/38] | SYSTÈME DE CODAGE DE BANDES DIAGNOSTIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 30.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11164171.8 / EP2363706 | EP12158167.2 / EP2463647 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2011 | BE | 15.06.2011 | CY | 15.06.2011 | CZ | 15.06.2011 | DK | 15.06.2011 | EE | 15.06.2011 | FI | 15.06.2011 | HU | 15.06.2011 | IT | 15.06.2011 | LT | 15.06.2011 | LV | 15.06.2011 | MT | 15.06.2011 | NL | 15.06.2011 | PL | 15.06.2011 | RO | 15.06.2011 | SE | 15.06.2011 | SI | 15.06.2011 | SK | 15.06.2011 | TR | 15.06.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | IE | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | LU | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | BG | 15.09.2011 | GR | 16.09.2011 | ES | 26.09.2011 | IS | 15.10.2011 | PT | 17.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LU | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LU | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LU | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 15.06.2011 | |
SE | 15.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002137059 (WU LEI [US], et al) [Y] 25 * figures 1-3 *; | [XA]EP1288653 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 26-33 * abstract *[A] 1-25; | [XY]US2006189895 (NEEL GARY T [US], et al) [X] 26-33 * paragraphs [0115] - [0129]; figures 18A-20 * [Y] 25 | Examination | EP1413879 | by applicant | EP1288653 | US2006189895 |