EP2134963 - Method of fabricating a wind turbine blade assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/52] | LIGHTWEIGHT COMPOSITE TRUSS WIND TURBINE BLADE | ||
[2014/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2015/23] |
Former [2015/17] | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 44 8200 Aarhus N / DK | ||
Former [2014/10] | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 44 8200 Aarhus N / DK | ||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Modular Wind Energy, Inc. 2161 Gundry Avenue Signal Hill, CA 90755 / US | ||
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Baker, Myles L. 100 E. San Antonio Drive Long Beach, CA 90807 / US | ||
For all designated states Modular Wind Energy, Inc. 2161 Gundry Avenue Signal Hill, CA 90755 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAKER, Myles L. 100E. San Antonio Drive Long Beach, CA 90807 / US | 02 /
ARENDT, Cory P. 16861 Phelps Lane Huntington Beach, CA 92649 / US | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Vestas Patents Department Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2015/17] |
Former [2014/10] | Swabe, Benjamin Vestas Wind Systems A/S IPR Department Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | ||
Former [2012/13] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/37] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Forrester House, 52 Bounds Green Road London N11 2EY / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07842393.6 | 13.09.2007 | [2009/52] | WO2007US78361 | Priority number, date | US20070725916 | 20.03.2007 Original published format: US 725916 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008115265 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2134963 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2134963 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
F03D1/0675 (EP,KR,US);
F03D1/0633 (KR,US);
F05B2240/30 (KR);
F05B2250/71 (EP,KR,US);
F05B2280/6003 (EP,KR,US);
F05B2280/6013 (EP,KR,US);
F05C2253/04 (EP,KR,US);
F05C2253/16 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T29/49332 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2009/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für ein Rotorblatt einer Windturbine | [2014/49] | English: | Method of fabricating a wind turbine blade assembly | [2014/49] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une pale d'éolienne | [2014/49] |
Former [2009/52] | WINDTURBINENSCHAUFEL MIT LEICHTEM VERBUNDGITTERTRÄGER | ||
Former [2009/52] | LIGHTWEIGHT COMPOSITE TRUSS WIND TURBINE BLADE | ||
Former [2009/52] | PALE D'ÉOLIENNE À POUTRE COMPOSITE LÉGÈRE | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 12.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.09.2007 | AT | 22.04.2015 | BE | 22.04.2015 | BG | 22.04.2015 | CY | 22.04.2015 | CZ | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | ES | 22.04.2015 | FI | 22.04.2015 | IT | 22.04.2015 | LT | 22.04.2015 | LV | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | MT | 22.04.2015 | NL | 22.04.2015 | PL | 22.04.2015 | RO | 22.04.2015 | SE | 22.04.2015 | SI | 22.04.2015 | SK | 22.04.2015 | TR | 22.04.2015 | GR | 23.07.2015 | IS | 22.08.2015 | PT | 24.08.2015 | IE | 13.09.2015 | LU | 13.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/21] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
IE | 13.09.2015 | ||
LU | 13.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
IE | 13.09.2015 | ||
LU | 13.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
IE | 13.09.2015 | ||
LU | 13.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 22.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1852622 (MILBURN LESSITER C); | [XI]US4339230 (HILL PAUL W); | [A]EP1184566 (TORRES MARTINEZ M [ES]) | International search | [Y]US1852622 (MILBURN LESSITER C); | [Y]US1949785 (LA CIERVA JUAN DE); | [Y]US2386019 (MICHAEL WATTER); | [Y]US4295790 (EGGERT JR WALTER S); | [Y]US5219454 (CLASS DENIS [US]); | [Y]US5375324 (WALLACE VERNON R [US], et al) | by applicant | US4339230 | US5284419 |