EP2084068 - ARTICLE ALIGNMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems, LLC 501 South 5th Street Richmond, VA 23219-0501 / US | [2011/16] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems LLC 501 South 5th Street Richmond, VA 23219-0501 / US | ||
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems LLC 11013 West Broad Street Glen Allen, VA 23060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHALENDAR, Eric 9 Allée Jean Virly 36330 Velles / FR | 02 /
POGET, Pierre-yves 93 Rue De Strasbourg 36000 Chateauroux / FR | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Coulson, Elizabeth Eve, et al Coulson & Rule 13 Whitehall Road Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 3AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Coulson, Elizabeth Eve, et al Coulson & Associates 5 Newbold Road Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 2LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07842787.9 | 19.09.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007US78899 | Priority number, date | GB20060018405 | 19.09.2006 Original published format: GB 0618405 | GB20060022344 | 09.11.2006 Original published format: GB 0622344 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008036745 | Date: | 27.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2084068 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65B35/56, B65B35/58, B65B21/02, B65B21/04 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
B65B21/02 (EP,US);
B65B35/56 (EP,US);
B65B35/58 (EP,US);
B65B21/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | ARTIKELAUSRICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/32] | English: | ARTICLE ALIGNMENT APPARATUS | [2009/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIGNEMENT D'ARTICLE | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 10.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/32] | 27.02.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.03.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1584559 (WANFRIED DRUCK KALDEN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,11-18 * figures 1,4,5,7 * * column 4, line 14 - line 57 * [Y] 4,5,8,10; | [X]DE3728291 (GOETZ WILHELM [DE]) [X] 11,12 * figures 1,3,4 * * abstract * * column 5, line 46 - line 54 * * column 7, line 36 - column 8, line 35 *; | [Y]DE3606461 (MASSOTT PHILIPP) [Y] 4,5,8,10 * the whole document * |