EP2073732 - TRANSCONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthes GmbH Eimattstrasse 3 4436 Oberdorf / CH | [2009/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAIDHA, Sean 220 Providence Hill Road East Fallowfield PA 19320 / US | 02 /
STRAUSBAUGH, William 45 Village Drive Newmanstown, PA 17073 / US | 03 /
WOLF, Boyd 910 Colonial Court Coatesville PA 19320 / US | 04 /
PEPE, Tom 9 Barclay Drive Turnersville NJ 08012 / US | 05 /
ROTH, Chris 1109 Timberland Drive West Chester PA 19380 / US | 06 /
DAVID, Rathbun 756 Pequea Avenue Gap PA 17527 / US | 07 /
MCDONOUGH, William 23 College Avenue Collegeville PA 19426 / US | [2010/23] |
Former [2009/27] | 01 /
SAIDHA, Sean 220 Providence Hill Road East Fallowfield PA 19320 / US | ||
02 /
STRAUSBAUGH, William 17 Village Drive Leola PA 17540 / US | |||
03 /
WOLF, Boyd 910 Colonial Court Coatesville PA 19320 / US | |||
04 /
PEPE, Tom 9 Barclay Drive Turnersville NJ 08012 / US | |||
05 /
ROTH, Chris 1109 Timberland Drive West Chester PA 19380 / US | |||
06 /
DAVID, Rathbun 756 Pequea Avenue Gap PA 17527 / US | |||
07 /
MCDONOUGH, William 23 College Avenue Collegeville PA 19426 / US | Representative(s) | Lusuardi, Werther Dr. Lusuardi AG Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Lusuardi, Werther Dr. Lusuardi AG Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 07843151.7 | 25.09.2007 | [2009/27] | WO2007US79426 | Priority number, date | US20060827016P | 26.09.2006 Original published format: US 827016 P | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008039777 | Date: | 03.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2073732 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2073732 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
A61B17/7052 (EP,US);
A61B17/70 (KR);
A61B17/7049 (US);
A61B17/82 (KR);
A61B17/86 (KR);
A61F2/44 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSKONNEKTOR | [2009/27] | English: | TRANSCONNECTOR | [2009/27] | French: | CONNECTEUR TRANSVERSAL | [2009/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 20.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2010 | BE | 03.11.2010 | CY | 03.11.2010 | CZ | 03.11.2010 | DK | 03.11.2010 | EE | 03.11.2010 | FI | 03.11.2010 | HU | 03.11.2010 | LT | 03.11.2010 | LV | 03.11.2010 | MT | 03.11.2010 | NL | 03.11.2010 | PL | 03.11.2010 | RO | 03.11.2010 | SE | 03.11.2010 | SI | 03.11.2010 | SK | 03.11.2010 | TR | 03.11.2010 | BG | 03.02.2011 | GR | 04.02.2011 | ES | 14.02.2011 | IS | 03.03.2011 | PT | 03.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
MT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
TR | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
MT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
MT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5693053 (ESTES BRADLEY T [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,13,15,16 * figure 2 * * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 11 *; | [Y]WO0057801 (SURGICAL DYNAMICS INC [US]) [Y] 17-20 * figures 2,3 * * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 13 *; | [Y]US6402751 (HOECK JAMES VAN [US], et al) [Y] 21 * figures 19,20 ** column 7, lines 6-55 *; | [Y]US2002143330 (SHLUZAS ALAN E [US]) [Y] 17,18,22,25 * paragraph [0014] * * figures 2,4 *; | [Y]US2005192572 (ABDELGANY MAHMOUD F [US], et al) [Y] 7,11-13,16 * figures 1,9 * * paragraphs [0045] , [0050] , [0056] *; | [XY]WO2005096974 (DEPUY SPINE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * figures 1a,1b,12 * * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 30 * [Y] 7,11-13,16-22,25 |