EP2080401 - RANDOM ACCESS SIGNALING TRANSMISSION FOR SYSTEM ACCESS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2019/24] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMNJANOVIC, Aleksandar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
MONTOJO, Juan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
MALLADI, Durga Prasad 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2019/24] |
Former [2009/30] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07843757.1 | 03.10.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007US80319 | Priority number, date | US20060828058P | 03.10.2006 Original published format: US 828058 P | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008042967 | Date: | 10.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2080401 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2080401 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L5/00, H04W52/16, H04W52/28, H04W52/32, H04W52/50, H04W74/00, H04W74/08 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
H04W74/002 (EP,BR,US);
H04L1/0029 (EP,BR,US);
H04W74/08 (KR);
H04L1/0032 (EP,BR,US);
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H04W52/16 (EP,BR,US);
H04W52/18 (KR);
H04W52/50 (EP,BR,US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04W74/0866 (EP,BR,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,BR,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/30] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/24] |
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DIREKTZUGRIFFS-SIGNALISIERUNGSÜBERTRAGUNG FÜR SYSTEMZUGANG IN EINER DRAHTLOS-KOMMUNIKATION | [2009/30] | English: | RANDOM ACCESS SIGNALING TRANSMISSION FOR SYSTEM ACCESS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION | [2009/30] | French: | TRANSMISSION DE SIGNALEMENT D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE POUR UN ACCÈS SYSTÈME DANS UNE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 12.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.12.2018 | 05.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19176927.2 / EP3554180 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | SE | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | IE | 03.10.2019 | LU | 03.10.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | IS | 12.11.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IE | 03.10.2019 | ||
LU | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IE | 03.10.2019 | ||
LU | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
LU | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
LU | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 12.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
LU | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | LT | 12.06.2019 | |
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | LT | 12.06.2019 | |
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 12.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9824250 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [X]US2004032877 (CHUAH MOOI CHOO [US], et al); | [X]US6738366 (ETEMAD KAMRAN [US], et al); | [XY]US2004147274 (KHAWAND CHARBEL [US], et al); | [X]EP1531644 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]EP1555765 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]US2006111104 (HYSLOP DOUGLAS A [US]); | [X]DE102005011426 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]); |