EP2073669 - AIR CONDITIONED BED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gentherm Incorporated 21680 Haggerty Road, Suite 101 Northville, MI 48167 / US | [2012/44] |
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states Amerigon, Inc. 21680 Haggerty Road Northville, MI 48167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRYKALSKI, Michael J. 140A N. Alta Vista Avenue Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | 02 /
CLARK, Jay Christopher 630 West Huntington Drive Unit 130 Arcadia, CA 91007 / US | 03 /
COMISKEY, Brian D. 2848 Cox Tustin, CA 92782 / US | [2012/47] |
Former [2009/27] | 01 /
BRYKALSKI, Michael J. 140A N. Alta Vista Avenue Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | ||
02 /
CLARK, Jay Christopher 630 West Huntington Drive Unit 130 Arcadia, CA 91007 / US | |||
03 /
COMISKEY, Brian D. 2848 Cox Tustin, CA 92782 / US | Representative(s) | Knights, Rupert Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | Knights, Rupert Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | ||
Former [2009/27] | Knights, Rupert Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07844306.6 | 15.10.2007 | [2009/27] | WO2007US81437 | Priority number, date | US20060851574P | 13.10.2006 Original published format: US 851574 P | US20070971197P | 10.09.2007 Original published format: US 971197 P | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008046110 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2073669 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2073669 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47C21/04 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
A47C21/044 (EP,US);
A47C21/048 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Title | German: | KLIMATISIERTES BETT | [2009/27] | English: | AIR CONDITIONED BED | [2009/27] | French: | LIT CLIMATISÉ | [2009/27] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 18.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12186706.3 / EP2567637 | EP13159826.0 / EP2609836 | EP13159829.4 / EP2606771 | EP14198493.0 / EP2921083 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2007 | AT | 21.11.2012 | BE | 21.11.2012 | CY | 21.11.2012 | CZ | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | LV | 21.11.2012 | MC | 21.11.2012 | MT | 21.11.2012 | PL | 21.11.2012 | RO | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | SK | 21.11.2012 | TR | 21.11.2012 | BG | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 15.10.2007 | |
AT | 21.11.2012 | ||
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 15.10.2007 | |
AT | 21.11.2012 | ||
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02058165 (CHOI CHEOLHYEON [KR]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]FR1327862 (PHILIBERT P) [A] 1-12 * page 1 - page 2; figure - *; | [A]EP0621026 (SSI MEDICAL SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US5448788 (WU SHUENN-JENQ [TW]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | International search | [X]US4423308 (CALLAWAY MILTON A [US], et al); | [A]US5871151 (FIEDRICH JOACHIM [US]); | [A]US2006137099 (FEHER STEVE [US]) | by applicant | US4423308 |