04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
01.03.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
17.08.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
20.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
08.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
18.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
04.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
21.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
13.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] |
09.09.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
31.08.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.08.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.04.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.05.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.12.2009 |
First examination report |
|
23.12.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
17.07.2009 |
Change - inventor |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
19.06.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
19.06.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
12.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2009 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
29.05.2009 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
20.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.05.2009 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
18.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|