Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4967171B | Global Dossier | 04.07.2012 | B2 | JP2010507100 | 04.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US81735 | 18.10.2007 | US58320306 | 19.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2080027 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2011 | B1 | EP2080027 | 22.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US81735 | 18.10.2007 | US58320306 | 19.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE528650T | 15.10.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US81735 | 18.10.2007 | US58320306 | 19.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0717597 | 27.07.2021 | B8 | BRPI0717597 | 23.01.2018 | B1 | BRPI0717597 | 05.11.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US81735 | 18.10.2007 | US58320306 | 19.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2666588 | 25.02.2014 | C | CA2666588 | 02.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US81735 | 18.10.2007 | US58320306 | 19.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009004145 | 29.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US81735 | 18.10.2007 | US58320306 | 19.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008051782 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58320306 | 19.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7749717 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2010 | B2 | US2008096232 | 24.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58320306 | 19.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2372547T | 23.01.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US58320306 | 19.10.2006 |