EP2203670 - SANITARY CLAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT, NL, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson, Theodore D. 2219 Glenmoor Road South Clearwater, FL 33764 / US | For all designated states Boley-Johnson, Robin 2219 Glenmoor Road South Clearwater, Florida 33764 / US | [2010/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Chaillot, Geneviève, et al Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Chaillot, Geneviève, et al Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07844386.8 | 18.10.2007 | [2010/27] | WO2007US81755 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009051591 | Date: | 23.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2203670 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2203670 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/08, F16L23/04, F16L47/14, F16K7/06 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
F16L23/04 (EP);
F16K7/066 (EP);
F16L37/1225 (EP);
F16L47/14 (EP);
F16L2201/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/27] | F16L3/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/26] |
Former [2010/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KLEMME FÜR SANITÄREINRICHTUNGEN | [2010/27] | English: | SANITARY CLAMP | [2010/27] | French: | PINCE SANITAIRE | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 21.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2007 | AT | 24.06.2015 | BE | 24.06.2015 | CY | 24.06.2015 | CZ | 24.06.2015 | DK | 24.06.2015 | EE | 24.06.2015 | FI | 24.06.2015 | LT | 24.06.2015 | LV | 24.06.2015 | MC | 24.06.2015 | MT | 24.06.2015 | NL | 24.06.2015 | PL | 24.06.2015 | RO | 24.06.2015 | SI | 24.06.2015 | SK | 24.06.2015 | TR | 24.06.2015 | BG | 24.09.2015 | GR | 25.09.2015 | LU | 18.10.2015 | IS | 24.10.2015 | PT | 26.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
LU | 18.10.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
LU | 18.10.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
LU | 18.10.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
LU | 18.10.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
LU | 18.10.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 24.06.2015 | |
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3359018 (SIMONS CLIFFORD G) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007209164 (TOMASETTI KENNETH [US] ET AL) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3111997 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]GB886036 (CHURCHILL INSTR COMPANY LTD; BELL S ASBESTOS AND ENGINEERIN) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]FR722912 (GUIDO GATTANEO) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [AE]US7284731 (JOHNSON ET AL); | [A]US4527818 (RUNDELL); | [A]US4823442 (BEHR); | [A]US4417755 (GITTLEMAN); | [A]US6367849 (TATSUTA ET AL); | [A]US6139069 (RADZIK); | [A]US2004094958 (TREVERTON ET AL); | [A]US2005279893 (RAPP) |