Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9144036 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2015 | B2 | US2013142154 | 06.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92376107 | 25.10.2007 | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | US201313755285 | 31.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101171415B | Global Dossier | 08.08.2012 | B1 | KR20090077835 | 15.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US82740 | 26.10.2007 | US92376107 | 25.10.2007 | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101146812B | Global Dossier | 21.05.2012 | B1 | KR20110043778 | 27.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US82740 | 26.10.2007 | US92376107 | 25.10.2007 | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5129259B | Global Dossier | 30.01.2013 | B2 | JP2010508724 | 18.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US82740 | 26.10.2007 | US92376107 | 25.10.2007 | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2448336 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92376107 | 25.10.2007 | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | EP07844650 | 26.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2664714 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2015 | C | CA2664714 | 02.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US82740 | 26.10.2007 | US92376107 | 25.10.2007 | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2082599 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2015 | B1 | EP2082599 | 29.07.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US82740 | 26.10.2007 | US92376107 | 25.10.2007 | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0717308 | 01.12.2020 | B1 | BRPI0717308 | 15.10.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US82740 | 26.10.2007 | US92376107 | 25.10.2007 | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2893293 | 02.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92376107 | 25.10.2007 | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | CA2664714 | 26.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101529787B | 14.08.2013 | B | CN101529787 | 09.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US82740 | 26.10.2007 | US92376107 | 25.10.2007 | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI444051B | 01.07.2014 | B | TW200835361 | 16.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI487409B | 01.06.2015 | B | TW201433196 | 16.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008052195 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2008 | A3 | WO2008052195 | 02.05.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US92376107 | 25.10.2007 | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8391196 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2013 | B2 | US2008130589 | 05.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92376107 | 25.10.2007 | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20120080639 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US92376107 | 25.10.2007 | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2421937 | 20.06.2011 | C2 | RU2009119742 | 10.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US92376107 | 25.10.2007 | US86311806 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Divisional application | EP2448336 | Application refused : 01.04.2016 |