EP2087033 - CHEMICAL ADDITIVES TO MAKE POLYMERIC MATERIALS BIODEGRADABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bio-tec Environmental, LLC 13 Puesta Del Sol Cedar Crest, NM 87008 / US | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAKE, John, Allen 13 Puesta Del Sol Cedar Crest, NM 87008 / US | 02 /
ADAMS, Samuel, David 2420 Mesa Linda Drive, N.E. Albuquerque, NM 87112 / US | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | van Breda, Jacobus, et al Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | Van Breda, Jacobus, et al Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V. Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2011/11] | Van Breda, Jacobus, et al Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V., Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2009/33] | Kupecz, Arpad Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 07844780.2 | 31.10.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007US83245 | Priority number, date | US20060855430P | 31.10.2006 Original published format: US 855430 P | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008055240 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2087033 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2087033 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/09, C08L101/00, C08K5/092, C08K5/1535, C08K5/1545, C08L3/02, C08L23/06, C08L23/12, C08L25/06, C08L27/06, C08L67/02, C08L101/16 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
C08K5/09 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (US);
C08K5/0033 (EP,US);
C08K5/092 (EP,US);
C08K5/1535 (EP,US);
C08K5/1545 (EP,US);
C08L101/16 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (US);
C08L23/12 (US);
C08L25/06 (US);
C08L27/06 (US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31725 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0033, C08L101/16 (EP,US);
C08K5/092, C08L101/00 (US,EP);
C08K5/09, C08L101/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/1535, C08L101/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2009/33] | C08K5/00, C08K5/09, C08L101/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/50] |
Former [2009/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | CHEMISCHE ADDITIVE ZUM BIOABBAUBARMACHEN VON POLYMERMATERIALIEN | [2009/33] | English: | CHEMICAL ADDITIVES TO MAKE POLYMERIC MATERIALS BIODEGRADABLE | [2009/33] | French: | ADDITIFS CHIMIQUES POUR RENDRE DES MATIÈRES POLYMÈRES BIODÉGRADABLES | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 21.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.07.2019 | 01.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2007 | AT | 11.12.2019 | CY | 11.12.2019 | CZ | 11.12.2019 | EE | 11.12.2019 | FI | 11.12.2019 | LT | 11.12.2019 | LV | 11.12.2019 | MC | 11.12.2019 | MT | 11.12.2019 | RO | 11.12.2019 | SI | 11.12.2019 | SK | 11.12.2019 | TR | 11.12.2019 | BG | 11.03.2020 | GR | 12.03.2020 | IS | 11.04.2020 | PT | 06.05.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
TR | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 11.12.2019 | |
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 11.12.2019 | |
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 11.12.2019 | |
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 11.12.2019 | |
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5663216 (TOMKA IVAN [CH]) [Y] 1-20 * abstract *; | [X]US2003004232 (RUEDE PAUL [US]) [X] 1,3-7 * abstract ** paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0023] , [0031] , [0034] *; | [Y]EP1321289 (NISSEI KK [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1449869 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * | International search | [A]KR19990025900 ; | [Y]WO03046060 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [Y]EP1321289 (NISSEI KK [JP]) | by applicant | US5474995 | US5599960 | US6060046 | US6239173 | US6296889 | US2003157214 | US2004068059 | US2004076778 | US7037983 |