EP2086466 - AN IMPLANTABLE FLUID MANAGEMENT DEVICE FOR THE REMOVAL OF EXCESS FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sequana Medical AG Baarerstrasse 10 6304 Zug / CH | [2017/50] |
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Sequana Medical AG Baarerstrasse 10 6304 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states NovaShunt AG Sennweidstrasse 45 6312 Steinhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURNETT, Daniel 280 Sussex Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/50] |
Former [2013/20] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/33] | Zeller, Andreas Jones Day Rechtsanwälte Attorneys-at-Law Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07844792.7 | 31.10.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007US83261 | Priority number, date | US20060855247P | 31.10.2006 Original published format: US 855247 P | US20070933214 | 31.10.2007 Original published format: US 933214 | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008055248 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2086466 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2086466 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M27/00 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
A61M27/002 (EP,US);
A61M31/00 (US);
A61M2202/0014 (US);
A61M2202/0401 (US);
A61M2205/04 (US);
A61M2205/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2009/33] | A61F2/04, A61M5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/50] |
Former [2009/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 29.05.2009 | BA | 29.05.2009 | HR | 29.05.2009 | MK | 29.05.2009 | RS | 29.05.2009 | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE FLUID-MANAGEMENT-VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON ÜBERSCHÜSSIGER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2009/33] | English: | AN IMPLANTABLE FLUID MANAGEMENT DEVICE FOR THE REMOVAL OF EXCESS FLUID | [2009/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE FLUIDE IMPLANTABLE POUR RETIRER UN EXCÉDENT DE FLUIDE | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 10.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 14.09.2016 | [2016/46] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2007 | AT | 13.12.2017 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | ES | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | IT | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | PL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | SE | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | TR | 13.12.2017 | BG | 13.03.2018 | GR | 14.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/27] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006058731 (BURNETT DANIEL R [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13-20 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1, paragraph 11 - page 2, paragraph 26 * * page 3, paragraph 49 - page 14, paragraph 177; figures 1-36 *; | [X]US3669116 (HEYER WILLIAM T) [X] 1-3,5,8,10 * column 1, line 2 - column 2, line 75; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2004147871 (BURNETT DANIEL R [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1, paragraph 9 - page 2, paragraph 13 * * page 3, paragraph 38 - page 7, paragraph 71; figures 1-18 *; | [A]US4725207 (BUCHWALD HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8,10,14 * column 1, line 9 - column 1, line 17 * * column 2, line 5 - column 2, line 27 * * column 3, line 4 - column 8, line 58; figures 1-15 *; | [A]US4650463 (LEVEEN HARRY H [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 4 - column 5, line 15; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US5549579 (BATDORF DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 2,20 * column 1, line 14 - column 1, line 19 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 15 * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 20; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US2006036208 (BURNETT DANIEL R [US]); | [Y]US5071408 (AHMED ABDUL MATEEN [US]); | [Y]US5387188 (WATSON DAVID A [US]) |