EP2104886 - FLIGHT CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Embraer S.A. Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima 2170 12227-901 São José Dos Campos SP / BR | [2017/47] |
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states EMBRAER - Empresa Brasileira de Aeronáutica S.A. Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima 2170 12227-901 Sao José dos Campos SP / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLATI DE SOUZA, Álvara Vitos Rua Aruana, 157 Apto. 701 Pq. residencial Aquarius 12243-250, São José dos Campos, SP / BR | 02 /
REIS CALDEIRA, Fabrício Rua Dr. Orlando Feirabend Filho No 51, ap.62, Jd. Aquarius 12246-190, São José dos Campos, SP / BR | 03 /
GANGSAAS, Dagfinn 1665 Crowneway Mindens NV 89423 / US | 04 /
KLEIN, Jerome Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima, 2170 012227-901, São José dos Campos, SP / BR | 05 /
ROCHA BORGES, Lauro Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima, 2170 012227-901, São José dos Campos, SP / BR | 06 /
ANDRIOLI JUNIOR, Reneu Luiz Rua 28 de Setembro 79 VI Resende 12282-270, Caçapava-SP / BR | 07 /
TURY PASTORINI, Luciano Rua Euclides Miragaia 620/32, Centro 12245-820 São José dos Campos, SP / BR | 08 /
FONSECA, Marco Paulo Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima, 2170 012227-901 São José dos Campos, SP / BR | [2017/47] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
POLATI DE SOUZA, Álvara Vitos Rua Aruana, 157 Apto. 701 Pq. residencial Aquarius 12243-250, São José dos Campos, SP / BR | ||
02 /
REIS CALDEIRA, Fabrício Rua Dr. Orlando Feirabend Filho No 51, ap.62, Jd. Aquarius 12246-190, São José dos Campos, SP / BR | |||
03 /
GANGSAAS, Dagfinn 1665 Crowneway Mindens NV 89423 / US | |||
04 /
KLEIN, Jerome Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima, 2170 012227-901, São José dos Campos, SP / BR | |||
05 /
ROCHA BORGES, Lauro Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima, 2170 012227-901, São José dos Campos, SP / BR | |||
06 /
ANDRIOLI JUNIOR, Reneu Luiz Rua 28 de Setembro 79 VI Resende 12282-270, Caçapava-SP / BR | |||
07 /
TURY PASTORINI, Luciano Rua Euclides Miragaia 620/32, Centro 12245-820 São José dos Campos, SP / BR | |||
08 /
FONSECA, Marco Paulo Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima, 2170 012227-901 São José dos Campos, SP / BR | |||
Former [2009/40] | 01 /
POLATI DE SOUZA, Álvara Vitos Rua Esperança 86 Apto. 75 12243-700, São José dos Campos, SP / BR | ||
02 /
REIS CALDEIRA, Fabrício Rua Dr. Orlando Feirabend Filho No 51, ap.62, Jd. Aquarius 12246-190, São José dos Campos, SP / BR | |||
03 /
GANGSAAS, Dagfinn 1665 Crowneway Mindens NV 89423 / US | |||
04 /
KLEIN, Jerome Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima, 2170 012227-901, São José dos Campos, SP / BR | |||
05 /
ROCHA BORGES, Lauro Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima, 2170 012227-901, São José dos Campos, SP / BR | |||
06 /
ANDRIOLI JUNIOR, Reneu Luiz Rua 28 de Setembro 79 VI Resende 12282-270, Caçapava-SP / BR | |||
07 /
TURY PASTORINI, Luciano Rua Euclides Miragaia 620/32, Centro 12245-820 São José dos Campos, SP / BR | |||
08 /
FONSECA, Marco Paulo Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima, 2170 012227-901 São José dos Campos, SP / BR | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2017/47] |
Former [2014/15] | Liesegang, Eva, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/40] | PROPI, S.L. C/ Jorge Juan 19, 3° 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 07845466.7 | 11.12.2007 | [2009/40] | WO2007BR00340 | Priority number, date | GB20060024700 | 11.12.2006 Original published format: GB 0624700 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008070944 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2104886 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2104886 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/08, G05D1/06 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
G05D1/0676 (EP,US);
B64C9/32 (GB);
B64C19/02 (GB);
G05D1/0607 (GB);
G05D1/08 (US);
G05D1/0808 (US)
|
Former IPC [2009/40] | G05D1/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/47] |
Former [2009/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FLUGLEITSYSTEM | [2009/40] | English: | FLIGHT CONTROL SYSTEM | [2009/40] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE VOL | [2009/40] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/40] | 19.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2007 | AT | 22.11.2017 | CY | 22.11.2017 | CZ | 22.11.2017 | DK | 22.11.2017 | EE | 22.11.2017 | ES | 22.11.2017 | FI | 22.11.2017 | IT | 22.11.2017 | LT | 22.11.2017 | LV | 22.11.2017 | MC | 22.11.2017 | NL | 22.11.2017 | PL | 22.11.2017 | PT | 22.11.2017 | RO | 22.11.2017 | SE | 22.11.2017 | SI | 22.11.2017 | SK | 22.11.2017 | TR | 22.11.2017 | IE | 11.12.2017 | LU | 11.12.2017 | MT | 11.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | BG | 22.02.2018 | GB | 22.02.2018 | GR | 23.02.2018 | IS | 22.03.2018 | DE | 03.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 11.12.2007 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GB | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 11.12.2007 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GB | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.12.2007 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GB | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GB | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GB | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.12.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.12.2017 | ||
MT | 11.12.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]US3589648 (GORHAM JOHN A, et al); | [A]US4363098 (BUUS HENNING, et al); | [A]US5337982 (SHERRY LANCE [US]); | [XI]EP0708393 (HONEYWELL INC [US]); | [XI]US5823479 (NIELD BRIAN N [US], et al); | [A]US6062513 (LAMBREGTS ANTONIUS A [US]); | [XDI]WO2006016070 (AIRBUS FRANCE [FR], et al) | International search | [A]US3040316 (SATHER DELAINE C); | [A]US3252675 (CLOSE KEITH E, et al); | [Y]US4363098 (BUUS HENNING, et al); | [X]US5112009 (FARINEAU JACQUES [FR]) | by applicant | US3589648 | US3738594 | US3774869 | US3850388 | US4489907 | WO2006016070 |