|
09.10.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.10.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.07.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
21.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2010 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.07.2009 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
30 |