Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2128975 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2014 | B1 | EP2128975 | 31.07.2013 | A4 | EP2128975 | 02.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN200710076826 | 30.08.2007 | CN200610157298 | 05.12.2006 | WO2007CN71182 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101197555 | 11.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200610157298 | 05.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101378239B | 12.10.2011 | B | CN101378239 | 04.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200710076826 | 30.08.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008067769 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN200710076826 | 30.08.2007 | CN200610157298 | 05.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7755317 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2010 | B2 | US2008129241 | 05.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN200710076826 | 30.08.2007 | CN200610157298 | 05.12.2006 |