EP2087208 - TURBO ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines GmbH Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖCK, Alexander Grafrather Strasse 53 82288 Kottgeisering / DE | [2009/33] | Application number, filing date | 07846281.9 | 30.10.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007DE01946 | Priority number, date | DE20061052786 | 09.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006052786 | [2009/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008055474 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2087208 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2087208 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/04] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2087208 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/22 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
F01D11/22 (EP,US);
F05D2250/61 (EP,US);
F05D2250/611 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | TURBOMASCHINE | [2009/33] | English: | TURBO ENGINE | [2009/33] | French: | TURBOMACHINE | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 08.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.01.2011 | CZ | 26.01.2011 | DK | 26.01.2011 | EE | 26.01.2011 | FI | 26.01.2011 | HU | 26.01.2011 | IE | 26.01.2011 | IT | 26.01.2011 | LT | 26.01.2011 | LV | 26.01.2011 | MT | 26.01.2011 | NL | 26.01.2011 | PL | 26.01.2011 | RO | 26.01.2011 | SE | 26.01.2011 | SI | 26.01.2011 | SK | 26.01.2011 | TR | 26.01.2011 | BG | 26.04.2011 | GR | 27.04.2011 | ES | 07.05.2011 | IS | 26.05.2011 | PT | 26.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
MT | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
TR | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
MT | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 26.01.2011 | |
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2458676 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 8-10* page 2, lines 16-35; figures 1,2 *; | [X]JPS5820904 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-13 * abstract *; | [X]JPS62142808 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]GB2195715 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC) [A] 1-7,9-13 * abstract *; | [X]US5344284 (DELVAUX JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document * |