EP2084358 - SLIDING DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blasi - GmbH Automatische Türanlagen Carl-Benz-Strasse 5-15 77972 Mahlberg / DE | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLASI, Peter Carl-Benz-Str. 5-15 77972 Mahlberg / DE | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Goy, Wolfgang PATENTANWALT Zähringer Strasse 373 79108 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Goy, Wolfgang Zähringer Strasse 373 79108 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07846329.6 | 14.11.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007DE02049 | Priority number, date | DE20061054927 | 22.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006054927 | [2009/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008061497 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2084358 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2084358 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/14 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
E05D15/1042 (EP,US);
E05F15/638 (EP,US);
E05D15/0678 (EP,US);
E05D2015/1055 (EP,US);
E05D2015/106 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/434 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | SCHIEBETÜR | [2009/32] | English: | SLIDING DOOR | [2009/32] | French: | PORTE COULISSANTE | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 06.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.09.2010 | CZ | 01.09.2010 | DK | 01.09.2010 | EE | 01.09.2010 | FI | 01.09.2010 | IE | 01.09.2010 | IT | 01.09.2010 | LT | 01.09.2010 | LV | 01.09.2010 | MT | 01.09.2010 | NL | 01.09.2010 | PL | 01.09.2010 | RO | 01.09.2010 | SE | 01.09.2010 | SI | 01.09.2010 | SK | 01.09.2010 | TR | 01.09.2010 | LU | 14.11.2010 | BE | 30.11.2010 | FR | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | BG | 01.12.2010 | GR | 02.12.2010 | ES | 12.12.2010 | IS | 01.01.2011 | PT | 03.01.2011 | HU | 02.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
MT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
TR | 01.09.2010 | ||
LU | 14.11.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
HU | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
MT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
LU | 14.11.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
HU | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
MT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
HU | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
MT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
MT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/28] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | CY | 01.09.2010 | |
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IE | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0953706 (KABA GILGEN AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,8-11 * claims 1-3 * * figures 1,2,5 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0019] *; | [X]WO0079689 (AUTOWIN CORP [KR], et al) [X] 1-7,9-12 * figures 1-5,16,19-21 * * claims 1,2,22 * * page 9, lines 5-19 * * page 20, lines 24-34 - page 21, lines 1,2 * * page 28, lines 7-29 *; | [X]DE202005000589U (SCHUECO INT KG [DE]) [X] 1-7,9-11 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0019] , [0023] , [0024] *; | [X] - SCHÜCO, "Schüco e-slide", SCHÜCO HOMEPAGE (DE), http://www.schueco.nl/pdffiles/031/10385algemeen.pdf, (200512), page 3/9, XP002469969 [X] 1-7,9-12 * the whole document * | [X] - SCHÜCO INTERNATIONAL KG - ULRIKE KRÜGER, "Schüko Schiebeelemente mit e-slide", BAUHERRENPRESSE, http://www.schueco.de/pdffiles/049/123350054_BNEU.doc, (200511), no. B054, pages 1 - 2, XP002469970 [X] 1-7,9-12 * the whole document * |