EP2121451 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WRAPPING A STACK WITH A WRAPPING SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schur Packaging Systems A/S Fuglevangsvej 41 8700 Horsens / DK | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JØRGENSEN, Kristian Nordrevej 24 8700 Horsens / DK | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Nielsen, Leif, et al Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Nielsen, Leif, et al Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | ||
Former [2009/48] | Nielsen, Leif, et al Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Åarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 07846427.8 | 20.12.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007DK00557 | Priority number, date | DK20060001682 | 20.12.2006 Original published format: DK 200601682 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008074325 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2121451 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2121451 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65B25/14, B65B11/08 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
B65B25/14 (EP,US);
B65B11/08 (US);
B65B11/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Extension states | AL | 06.07.2009 | BA | 06.07.2009 | HR | 06.07.2009 | MK | 06.07.2009 | RS | 06.07.2009 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINPACKEN EINES STAPELS MIT EINEM VERPACKUNGSBOGEN | [2009/48] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WRAPPING A STACK WITH A WRAPPING SHEET | [2009/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR L'EMBALLAGE D'UN EMPILEMENT AVEC UNE FEUILLE D'EMBALLAGE | [2012/48] |
Former [2009/48] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR L'EMBALLAGE D'UN EMPILEMENT AVEC UNE FEUILLE D'EMBALLAGE | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 31.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Ferag AG Zürichstrasse 74 8340 Hinwil / CH Opponent's representative Rentsch Partner AG, et al, et al Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Ferag AG Zürichstrasse 74 8340 Hinwil / CH Opponent's representative Rentsch Partner AG, et al, et al Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | 14.02.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.06.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M07) | 21.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.05.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.02.2017 | 01.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.06.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/42] | 08.02.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2007 | AT | 10.04.2013 | BE | 10.04.2013 | CY | 10.04.2013 | CZ | 10.04.2013 | EE | 10.04.2013 | FI | 10.04.2013 | IT | 10.04.2013 | LT | 10.04.2013 | LV | 10.04.2013 | MC | 10.04.2013 | MT | 10.04.2013 | NL | 10.04.2013 | PL | 10.04.2013 | RO | 10.04.2013 | SI | 10.04.2013 | SK | 10.04.2013 | TR | 10.04.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.07.2013 | ES | 21.07.2013 | IS | 10.08.2013 | PT | 12.08.2013 | GB | 20.12.2013 | IE | 20.12.2013 | LU | 20.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | [2016/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 20.12.2007 | |
AT | 10.04.2013 | ||
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
TR | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
GB | 20.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 20.12.2007 | |
AT | 10.04.2013 | ||
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
TR | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
GB | 20.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
TR | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
GB | 20.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
GB | 20.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 10.04.2013 | |
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 10.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1583395 (TREVOR DAVIDSON, et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]US5103617 (SJOGREN CHRISTER A [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0532944 (KREMPEL AUGUST SOEHNE [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]NL9300006 (WILHELMUS CORNELIUS ANTONIUS O) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US1583395 (TREVOR DAVIDSON, et al); | [A]US4021993 (WIDMER RENE); | [A]US5009055 (SIMMONS CHRIS B [US]); | [A]US5189865 (ANDRADE JOSE A [US], et al); | [X]NL9300006 (WILHELMUS CORNELIUS ANTONIUS O); | [A]EP1227040 (INNOPACK S R L [IT], et al); | [A]WO03008273 (SCHUR PACKAGING SYSTEMS AS [DK], et al); | [A]US2003167736 (CINOTTI ANDREA [IT]) | by applicant | US5009055 | NL9300006 | WO03008273 |