EP2121177 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTING CORROSION ON A GAS INLET NOZZLE DURING NITRIC ACID CONDENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 44141 Dortmund / DE | [2011/51] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 44141 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAURER, Rainer Martinstrasse 14 58332 Schwelm / DE | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR Rosa-Luxemburg-Strasse 18 44141 Dortmund / DE | [2012/02] |
Former [2009/48] | Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR Rosa-Luxemburg-Strasse 18 44141 Dortmund / DE | Application number, filing date | 07846701.6 | 21.11.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007EP10062 | Priority number, date | DE20071006889 | 13.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007006889 | [2009/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008098600 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2121177 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2121177 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/26, C01B21/28 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
B01J19/26 (EP,NO,US);
C01B21/28 (EP,NO,US);
B01J4/001 (EP,US);
B01J4/002 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00119 (EP,US);
Y10S423/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR VERHINDERUNG DER KORROSION AN EINEM GASEINTRITTSSTUTZEN BEI EINER SALPETERSÄUREKONDENSATION | [2009/48] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTING CORROSION ON A GAS INLET NOZZLE DURING NITRIC ACID CONDENSATION | [2009/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR EMPÊCHER LA CORROSION D'UNE TUBULURE D'ENTRÉE DE GAZ LORS D'UNE CONDENSATION D'ACIDE NITRIQUE | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 20.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2007 | CY | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | IE | 11.01.2012 | IT | 11.01.2012 | LT | 11.01.2012 | LV | 11.01.2012 | MT | 11.01.2012 | PL | 11.01.2012 | RO | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | IS | 11.05.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | LT | 11.01.2012 | |
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | LT | 11.01.2012 | |
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 11.01.2012 | |
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 11.01.2012 | |
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 11.01.2012 | |
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1195280 (PINTSCH BAMAG AG) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 23; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US3467498 (BENNER FLOYD E JR, et al) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [DA]US3586055 (WILSON WILLIAM L) [DA] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]WO9116266 (ENGINEERING DER VOEST ALPINE I [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 2; figure 1 * |