EP2092233 - LIGHTING UNIT FOR OPERATIONS OR EXAMINATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Leibinger Medizintechnik GmbH & Co. KG Kolbinger Strasse 10 78570 Mühlheim/Donau / DE | [2021/14] |
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states Karl Leibinger Medizintechnik Gmbh & Co. Kg Kolbinger Strasse 10 78570 Mühlheim/Donau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRÖLIN, Joachim Bachstrasse 9 78570 Mühlheim/Stetten / DE | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2021/14] |
Former [2009/35] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07846754.5 | 22.11.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007EP10152 | Priority number, date | DE20062017914U | 24.11.2006 Original published format: DE 202006017914 U | DE20072015823U | 13.11.2007 Original published format: DE 202007015823 U | [2009/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008061767 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2092233 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2092233 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/02] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2092233 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/00, F21W131/205, F21Y115/10 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
F21V23/04 (EP,US);
F21W2131/205 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/35] | F21S8/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/14] |
Former [2009/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OPERATIONS- ODER UNTERSUCHUNGSLEUCHTE | [2009/35] | English: | LIGHTING UNIT FOR OPERATIONS OR EXAMINATIONS | [2009/35] | French: | LAMPE D'EXAMEN MÉDICAL OU D'INTERVENTION CHIRURGICALE | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 22.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.2012
05.03.2013
WITHDRAWN Berchtold Holding GmbH Ludwigstaler Strasse 25 78532 Tuttlingen / DE Opponent's representative Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB, et al, et al Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [2020/26] |
Former [2016/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.2012
05.03.2013
ADMISSIBLE Berchtold Holding GmbH Ludwigstaler Strasse 25 78532 Tuttlingen / DE Opponent's representative Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR, et al, et al Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.2012
Berchtold Holding GmbH Ludwigstaler Strasse 25 78532 Tuttlingen / DE Opponent's representative Schmidt, Christian, et al, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | 19.11.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.05.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.01.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.10.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.11.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.11.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.03.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 14.12.2018 | Appeal received No. T2940/18 | 12.02.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.11.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 11.02.2015 | Appeal received No. T0342/15 | 21.05.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.06.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 13.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.06.2016 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2007 | CY | 11.01.2012 | CZ | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | IE | 11.01.2012 | LT | 11.01.2012 | LV | 11.01.2012 | MT | 11.01.2012 | PL | 11.01.2012 | RO | 11.01.2012 | SE | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | IS | 11.05.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | LU | 22.11.2012 | BE | 30.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | AT | 22.11.2020 | [2021/37] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 22.11.2007 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
LU | 22.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
LU | 22.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/38] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 11.01.2012 | |
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 11.01.2012 | |
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 11.01.2012 | |
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10034594 (SIRONA DENTAL SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-8,16-21,23,24 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US2004129860 (THIBAUD PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0066]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE102006004995 (SCHOTT AG [DE]) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP1722157 (TRUMPF KREUZER MED SYS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-26* paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1-6 * | Opposition | EP0890059 |