EP2054556 - JET DIFFUSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neoperl GmbH Klosterrunsstr. 11 79379 Müllheim / DE | [2015/27] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Neoperl GmbH Klosterrunsstrasse 11 79379 Müllheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRETHER, Hermann Weilermatt 4 79379 Müllheim / DE | 02 /
STEIN, Alexander Lenzbergstrasse 1 79241 Ihringen / DE | 03 /
OECHSLE, Daniel Neue Parkstr. 7 79379 Müllheim / DE | 04 /
WEIS, Christoph Am Lerchenbuck 6 79379 Müllheim / DE | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Kunst, Manuel Nikolaus Johannes, et al Maucher Jenkins Patent-und Rechtsanwälte Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Kunst, Manuel Nikolaus Johannes, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | ||
Former [2014/37] | Kunst, Manuel Nikolaus Johannes, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | ||
Former [2009/19] | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | Application number, filing date | 07846919.4 | 30.11.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007EP10394 | Priority number, date | DE20071003296 | 23.01.2007 Original published format: DE102007003296 | [2009/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008089808 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2054556 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2054556 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/08, E03C1/084 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
E03C1/084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [2015/27] |
Former [2010/16] | DE, ES, IT | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STRAHLBELÜFTER | [2009/19] | English: | JET DIFFUSOR | [2009/19] | French: | AÉRATEUR DE JET | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 19.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 04.07.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 25.08.2012 | Appeal received No. T2414/12 | 05.11.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.03.2014 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2014/10] | 05.05.2014 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2014/19] | 18.08.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 01.07.2015 | [2016/10] | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2004199995 (BUI LE TRONG [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,10,11,14,16 * the whole document * [A] 8,9; | [AD]DE1107607 (AGHNIDES ELIE P) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE1184706 (AGHNIDES ELIE P) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE3418165 (GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH [DE]) [AD] 1 * page 9, lines 4-8; figure 1 *; | [A]DE202005001165U (NEOPERL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0058] , [0067] * |