EP2097160 - Microdevice and method for treating liquid specimens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/37] | MICRODEVICE FOR TREATING LIQUID SPECIMENS. | ||
[2012/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOUILLET, Yves 17 chemin des Carrières 38340 Voreppe / FR | 02 /
DAVOUST, Laurent 30 rue Jules Ferry 72510 Requeil / FR | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2009/37] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07847689.2 | 03.12.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007EP63178 | Priority number, date | FR20060055327 | 05.12.2006 Original published format: FR 0655327 | [2009/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008068229 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2097160 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2097160 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/08, B01F13/00, B01D43/00, F04B17/00, G01N1/28, G01N33/487, G01N9/32 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
B01L3/5088 (EP,US);
B01F33/3021 (EP,US);
B01F23/41 (EP,US);
B01F33/3031 (EP,US);
F04B19/006 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0647 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | Mikrovorrichtung und Verfahren zur Behandlung von flüssigen Proben | [2012/13] | English: | Microdevice and method for treating liquid specimens | [2012/13] | French: | Micro-dispositif et procédé de traitement d'échantillons liquides | [2012/13] |
Former [2009/37] | MIKROVORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FLÜSSIGEN PROBEN | ||
Former [2009/37] | MICRODEVICE FOR TREATING LIQUID SPECIMENS. | ||
Former [2009/37] | MICRO-DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'ÉCHANTILLONS LIQUIDES. | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.10.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 07.10.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2007 | AT | 03.04.2013 | CY | 03.04.2013 | CZ | 03.04.2013 | DK | 03.04.2013 | EE | 03.04.2013 | FI | 03.04.2013 | IT | 03.04.2013 | LT | 03.04.2013 | LV | 03.04.2013 | MC | 03.04.2013 | MT | 03.04.2013 | NL | 03.04.2013 | PL | 03.04.2013 | RO | 03.04.2013 | SE | 03.04.2013 | SI | 03.04.2013 | SK | 03.04.2013 | TR | 03.04.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | GR | 04.07.2013 | ES | 14.07.2013 | IS | 03.08.2013 | PT | 05.08.2013 | IE | 03.12.2013 | LU | 03.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 03.12.2007 | |
AT | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
TR | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
TR | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
IE | 03.12.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
LU | 03.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 03.04.2013 | |
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 03.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6565727 (SHENDEROV ALEXANDER DAVID [US]) [X] 1,9-11,15 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 5 * * figure 6 * [A] 2-8,12-14,16-30; | [XA]US2003183525 (ELROD SCOTT A [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,9,15,16 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0043] * * figures 10,11 * [A] 2,4,6-8,10-14,17-30; | [A]WO2005047696 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 2, line 1 - line 20 ** figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US2006132542 (BRUYKER DIRK D [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8,9,15,16 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0044] * * figures 6A,6B,7A,7B * [A] 2-4,6,7,10-14,17-30 |