04.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
10.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
15.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
07.02.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
01.03.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
28.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.08.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.08.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.08.2012 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
26.04.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.02.2012 |
Change - German title |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
24.02.2012 |
Change - English title |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
24.02.2012 |
Change - French title |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
29.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.10.2011 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
21.10.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.10.2011 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
18.10.2011 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
10.10.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.07.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.04.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.08.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.06.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.04.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
12.02.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] |
05.02.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.02.2010 |
First examination report |
|
05.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.08.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
07.08.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
29.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.06.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|