Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8444836 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2013 | B2 | US2010320088 | 23.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP63178 | 03.12.2007 | FR0655327 | 05.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5166436B | Global Dossier | 21.03.2013 | B2 | JP2010511506 | 15.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP63178 | 03.12.2007 | FR0655327 | 05.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2097160 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2013 | B1 | EP2097160 | 09.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007EP63178 | 03.12.2007 | FR0655327 | 05.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008068229 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0655327 | 05.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2909293 | 22.04.2011 | B1 | FR2909293 | 06.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0655327 | 05.12.2006 |