blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2115326

EP2115326 - SPUR GEAR DIFFERENTIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2012
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
[2012/11]
Former [2010/20]For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Former [2009/46]For all designated states
Schaeffler KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Former [2009/46]For all designated states
Schaeffler KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BIERMANN, Thorsten
Schlehenweg 11
96172 Mühlhausen / DE
02 / JURJANZ, Ramon
Steinheilstrasse 41
91058 Erlangen / DE
 [2009/46]
Application number, filing date07847905.206.12.2007
[2009/46]
WO2007EP63428
Priority number, dateDE2007100471031.01.2007         Original published format: DE102007004710
[2009/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2008092525
Date:07.08.2008
Language:DE
[2008/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2115326
Date:11.11.2009
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2115326
Date:20.07.2011
Language:DE
[2011/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.08.2008
ClassificationIPC:F16H48/10
[2009/46]
CPC:
F16H48/10 (EP,US); F16H48/11 (EP,US); F16H2048/106 (EP,US);
F16H2048/382 (EP,US); F16H48/40 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/46]
TitleGerman:STIRNRADDIFFERENZIAL[2009/46]
English:SPUR GEAR DIFFERENTIAL[2009/46]
French:DIFFÉRENTIEL À ROUES DROITES[2009/46]
Entry into regional phase31.08.2009National basic fee paid 
31.08.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
16.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.05.2011Fee for grant paid
20.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.12.2009
Opposition(s)23.04.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HU20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
TR20.07.2011
BG20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
GB06.12.2011
LU06.12.2011
BE31.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
TR20.07.2011
BG20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
GB06.12.2011
LU06.12.2011
BE31.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2013/29]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
BG20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
GB06.12.2011
LU06.12.2011
BE31.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2013/25]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
GB06.12.2011
LU06.12.2011
BE31.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2013/22]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
GB06.12.2011
BE31.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2013/14]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
GB06.12.2011
BE31.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2012/49]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
GB06.12.2011
BE31.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2012/46]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
GB06.12.2011
BE31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2012/34]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2012/31]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/23]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/21]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/20]CY20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/12]CY20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Cited inInternational search[A]US2269734  (POWELL LYMAN S) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3375735  (SAARI OLIVER E) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH11108156  (TOCHIGI FUJI SANGYO KK) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [AD]EP0918177  (HOEHN BERND ROBERT PROF DR ING [DE]) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1717485  (AMERICAN AXLE & MFG INC [US]) [A] 1-6* figure 2 *;
 [A]  - HOEHN B-R ET AL, "KOMPAKTES ACHSGETRIEBE FUER FAHRZEUGE MIT FRONTANTRIEB UND QUER EINGEBAUTEM MOTOR", ATZ AUTOMOBILTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, VIEWEG PUBLISHING, WIESBADEN, DE, (200601), vol. 108, no. 1, ISSN 0001-2785, pages 46 - 51, XP001238419 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0918177
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.