EP2079610 - PROTECTIVE COVER FOR AN ELECTRONICS-INTEGRATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jtekt Europe Z. I. du Broteau 69540 Irigny / FR | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUILLARD, Grégory 33 rue Piéroux 69700 Givors / FR | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2009/30] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07848286.6 | 25.09.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007FR01563 | Priority number, date | FR20060009072 | 17.10.2006 Original published format: FR 0609072 | [2009/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008046976 | Date: | 24.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2079610 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2079610 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/023, B62D5/04, H05K5/06 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
B62D5/0406 (EP);
F16J15/14 (EP);
H05K5/061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Title | German: | SCHUTZABDECKUNG FÜR EIN ELEKTRONIKINTEGRIERENDES SYSTEM | [2009/30] | English: | PROTECTIVE COVER FOR AN ELECTRONICS-INTEGRATING SYSTEM | [2009/30] | French: | CAPOT DE PROTECTION POUR SYSTEME INTEGRANT DE L'ELECTRONIQUE | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 25.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.02.2010 | CY | 17.02.2010 | DK | 17.02.2010 | EE | 17.02.2010 | FI | 17.02.2010 | IE | 17.02.2010 | IT | 17.02.2010 | LT | 17.02.2010 | LV | 17.02.2010 | MT | 17.02.2010 | NL | 17.02.2010 | PL | 17.02.2010 | RO | 17.02.2010 | SE | 17.02.2010 | SI | 17.02.2010 | SK | 17.02.2010 | TR | 17.02.2010 | BG | 17.05.2010 | GR | 18.05.2010 | ES | 28.05.2010 | IS | 17.06.2010 | PT | 17.06.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | LU | 25.09.2010 | BE | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
LU | 25.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | ES | 28.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [DA]FR2854604 (KOYO STEERING EUROPE KSE [FR]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE10348358 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016]; figures 2,3 * |