04.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
15.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
10.01.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
16.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
02.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
01.02.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
29.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.10.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.06.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.03.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.02.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] |
04.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.11.2009 |
First examination report |
|
24.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.07.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
31.07.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
01.07.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.06.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.07.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|