EP2094482 - LABELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovia Films Limited Station Road Wigton, Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states Innovia Films Limited Station Road Wigton Cumbria CA7 9BG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACINTYRE, Fiona 6 Adelphi Terrace Carlisle Cumbria CA2 4BE / GB | [2013/10] |
Former [2009/36] | 01 /
MACINTYRE, Fiona 6 Adelphi Terrace Carlisle Cumbria CA2 4BE / GB | Representative(s) | Brand, Thomas Louis WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Brand, Thomas Louis WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Brand, Thomas Louis W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07848722.0 | 17.12.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007GB50762 | Priority number, date | GB20060025171 | 18.12.2006 Original published format: GB 0625171 | GB20070001339 | 24.01.2007 Original published format: GB 0701339 | GB20070016453 | 23.08.2007 Original published format: GB 0716453 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008075098 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2094482 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2094482 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B32B25/14, G03G7/00 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B25/14 (EP,US);
G03G7/004 (EP,US);
G03G7/0053 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | ETIKETTEN | [2009/36] | English: | LABELS | [2009/36] | French: | ÉTIQUETTES | [2009/36] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2007 | AT | 06.03.2013 | BE | 06.03.2013 | CY | 06.03.2013 | CZ | 06.03.2013 | DK | 06.03.2013 | EE | 06.03.2013 | FI | 06.03.2013 | LT | 06.03.2013 | LV | 06.03.2013 | MC | 06.03.2013 | MT | 06.03.2013 | PL | 06.03.2013 | RO | 06.03.2013 | SE | 06.03.2013 | SI | 06.03.2013 | SK | 06.03.2013 | BG | 06.06.2013 | GR | 07.06.2013 | ES | 17.06.2013 | IS | 06.07.2013 | PT | 08.07.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 17.12.2007 | |
AT | 06.03.2013 | ||
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 06.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004024445 (GERRO PLAST GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-26 * page 1, line 4 - line 7 * * page 2, line 49 - page 3, line 76 * * page 5, line 164 - page 6, line 185 * * page 8, line 256 - page 9, line 283 * * claims 1,6 *; | [A]JPH09114380 (FUJI SEAL IND CO LTD) [A] 1-26 * abstract * |