EP2100419 - MOBILITY BETWEEN UMA ACCESS AND GPRS/UMTS ACCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERON, Didier 4, chemin Bois Rivaux 44240 la Chapelle sur Erdre / FR | 02 /
MONCHANIN, Jean-Pierre 26, rue du Honduras 44600 Saint Nazaire / FR | 03 /
DESORBAY, Eric 5, impasse de la Grande Pièce 44750 Campbon / FR | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | El Manouni, Josiane, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Patent Business Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | El Manouni, Josiane, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2009/38] | El Manouni, Josiane Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07848877.2 | 11.09.2007 | [2009/38] | WO2007IB03460 | Priority number, date | US20060843401P | 11.09.2006 Original published format: US 843401 P | [2009/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008047231 | Date: | 24.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2100419 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
H04W88/14 (EP);
H04W76/20 (EP);
H04W80/04 (EP);
H04W88/06 (EP);
H04W88/182 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Title | German: | MOBILITÄT ZWISCHEN EINEM UMA-ZUGANG UND EINEM GPRS/UMTS-ZUGANG | [2009/38] | English: | MOBILITY BETWEEN UMA ACCESS AND GPRS/UMTS ACCESS | [2009/38] | French: | MOBILITE ENTRE UN ACCES UMA ET UN ACCES GPRS/UMTS | [2009/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 27.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2016/30] | 27.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/23] | 03.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006104262 (KANT NISHI [US] ET AL) [X] 1,7-12 * column A * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0103] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO2006056069 (RES IN MOTION LTD [CA]; BUCKLEY ADRIAN [US]; BULLIMER GEORGE BALDWIN [) [A] 1,7-12 * abstract * * page 3, line 17 - page 24, line 12 * * figures 1-12 * |