EP2102413 - PROCESS FOR INCREASING THE BASIS WEIGHT OF SHEET MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, MT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [2009/39] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DYER, Thomas Joseph 1387 South Park Avenue Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 02 /
NICKEL, Deborah Joy 1108 West Ridgeview Drive Appleton, Wisconsin 54914 / US | 03 /
ZWICK, Kenneth John 730 Congress Place Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 04 /
GOULET, Mike T. W7454 Ridgeside Drive Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 05 /
TIMM, Jeffrey J. N8704 County Highway M Menasha, Wisconsin 54952 / US | 06 /
CLOUGH, Perry H. 750 Elm Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/39] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07849146.1 | 15.11.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007IB54652 | Priority number, date | US20060635385 | 07.12.2006 Original published format: US 635385 | US20070818513 | 14.06.2007 Original published format: US 818513 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008068659 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2102413 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2102413 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/00, A61K8/81, A61K8/02, D21H27/00, D21H17/35, D21H17/37 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
D21H5/0025 (KR);
A61K8/8111 (EP,US);
A61K8/8147 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C11D17/04 (KR);
D21H17/37 (EP,US);
D21H21/146 (EP,US);
D21H21/20 (EP,US);
D21H21/22 (EP,US);
D21H27/002 (EP,US);
D21H27/005 (EP,US);
D21H27/008 (EP,US);
D21H5/0092 (KR);
D21H5/2664 (KR);
D21H17/35 (EP,US);
D21H19/20 (EP,US);
D21H19/22 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/39] | D21H25/00, D21H23/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES BASISGEWICHTS EINES SCHICHTMATERIALS | [2015/16] | English: | PROCESS FOR INCREASING THE BASIS WEIGHT OF SHEET MATERIALS | [2009/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER LE POIDS DE MATÉRIAUX DE BASE | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/39] | VERFAHRENSSTEIGERUNG DES FLÄCHENGEWICHTS VON FLÄCHENGEBILDEN | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 20.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2007 | AT | 29.07.2015 | BE | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | MT | 29.07.2015 | NL | 29.07.2015 | PL | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | IE | 15.11.2015 | LU | 15.11.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005045292 (LINDSAY JEFFREY DEAN [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 1, paragraph 16 - page 2, paragraph 29 * * page 7, paragraph 73 - paragraph 74 * * page 8, paragraph 85 - paragraph 89 * * page 9, paragraph 94 * * page 10, paragraph 102 - page 11, paragraph 118 * * page 13, paragraph 131 - paragraph 132 * * page 16, paragraph 184 *; | [PX]WO2007070129 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-21 * claims 1-30 *; | [PX]WO2007070153 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-21 * claims 1-30 *; | [PX]WO2007070145 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-21 * claims 1-19 *; | [PX]WO2007075356 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-21 * claims 1-37 *; | [PX]WO2007078499 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-21 * page 23, line 32 - page 24, line 11 * * claims 1-28 *; | [PX]WO2007078342 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-21 * claims 1-25 ** page 24, line 23 - page 25, line 27 * | by applicant | US3338992 | US3341394 | US3502763 | US3502538 | US3542615 | US3645992 | US3692618 | US3802817 | US3849241 | US4076698 | US4100324 | US4340563 | US4375448 | US4528239 | US4599392 | US4818464 | US4988781 | US5098522 | US5129988 | US5260171 | US5272236 | US5275700 | US5278272 | US5328565 | US5334289 | US5382400 | US5384373 | US5389202 | US5431786 | US5496624 | US5500277 | US5514523 | US5529665 | US5554467 | US5566724 | US5624790 | US5628876 | US5677383 | US5844045 | US5869575 | US5885697 | US6111023 | US6316549 | US6448341 | US6538070 | US6566446 | WO2005021638 | WO2005021622 | US2005058693 | US2005058833 | US2005100754 | US2005192365 |