EP2103145 - AMBIENT LIGHTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TP Vision Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2012/33] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKULOVSKI, Dragan High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
CLOUT, Ramon A. W. High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
BARBIERI, Mauro High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/41] | Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2009/39] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07849302.0 | 03.12.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007IB54884 | Priority number, date | EP20060125690 | 08.12.2006 Original published format: EP 06125690 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008068698 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2103145 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/00, H05B37/02 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
H05B47/155 (EP,US);
H05B47/10 (EP,US);
G09G5/12 (EP,US);
H05B47/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | AMBIENT LIGHTING RAUMBELEUCHTUNG | [2009/39] | English: | AMBIENT LIGHTING | [2009/39] | French: | ÉCLAIRAGE AMBIANT | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 12.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006003604 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]WO2006003624 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-19* abstract * | Examination | EP2018062 | by applicant | EP2018062 |