Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2092071 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2092071



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(50)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 425
16.09.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.09.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 9
29.09.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.09.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
29.09.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.06.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.06.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.06.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 88
22.01.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.01.2014 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 6
16.01.2014 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 7
07.01.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.12.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 6
17.10.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
17.10.2013 Description Search / examination 3
17.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.10.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
10.06.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.06.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.10.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.10.2012 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
29.07.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
23.07.2009 Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.07.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
01.07.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
16.06.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.06.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
16.06.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
16.06.2009 Sequence listing Search / examination 2
24.04.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
12.09.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
12.09.2008 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
08.07.2008 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable International Searching Authority 1
07.07.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
19.06.2008 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 88
22.01.2008 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
22.01.2008 Claims International Searching Authority 8
22.01.2008 Description International Searching Authority 69
22.01.2008 Drawings International Searching Authority 11
22.01.2008 Sequence listing International Searching Authority 2
22.01.2008 Submission concerning representation International Searching Authority 2