EP2116116 - PERIPHERAL DEVICE FOR CONNECTION WITH A HOST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SanDisk IL Ltd. 7 Atir Yeda Street 44425 Kfar Saba / IL | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALOMON, Tavi 24 Hathia St. 58403 Holon / IL | 02 /
HUBERT, Jonathan 25280 Terrace Grove Rd. 95033-9705 Los Gatos / US | 03 /
HANLON, Jason, Patrick 617 Lassen Park CT Scotts Valley, CA 95066-5001 / US | 04 /
POMERANTZ, Itzhak 18 Golomb Street 43357 Kfar Saba / IL | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Tothill, John Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Tothill, John Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07849592.6 | 19.12.2007 | [2009/46] | WO2007IL01566 | Priority number, date | US20070883346P | 04.01.2007 Original published format: US 883346 P | US20070885923P | 22.01.2007 Original published format: US 885923 P | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008081425 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2116116 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/02 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
H05K5/0273 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/1637 (KR);
G06F1/1684 (KR);
G06K19/077 (KR);
H05K5/0247 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | PERIPHERIEGERÄT ZUR VERBINDUNG MIT EINEM HOST | [2009/46] | English: | PERIPHERAL DEVICE FOR CONNECTION WITH A HOST | [2009/46] | French: | PÉRIPHÉRIQUE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE CONNECTÉ À UN HÔTE | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 02.11.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5155663 (HARASE TOSHIKATSU [JP]) [A] 1-39 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 47; figure 1 *; | [X]US5889649 (NABETANI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-26,30-39 * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 19; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US6893268 (HARARI ELIYAHOU [US], et al) [A] 27-29 * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 63; figures 1-3 * * column 13, line 32 - line 48; figure 10 *; | [A]US2006047880 (LINDBLOM STEVEN L [US], et al) [A] 27-29* paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049]; figure 4 *; | [I]US2006212640 (LEE KIAN-LENG [TW], et al) [I] 27-29 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0022]; figure 1 *; | [A] - "STACKABLE PERSONAL COMPUTER MEMORY CARD INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION CARD", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19940901), vol. 37, no. 9, ISSN 0018-8689, page 531/532, XP000473496 [A] 1-39 * the whole document * |