EP2085455 - COKE OVEN WALL BRICKWORK STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2013/04] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOMIZO, Masahiko NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMURA, Kazuto NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
UEMATSU, Hiroshi NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 04 /
NAKASHIMA, Yoshiaki NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2015/03] |
Former [2009/32] | 01 /
YOKOMIZO, Masahiko NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMAMURA, Kazuto NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | |||
03 /
UEMATSU, Hiroshi NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | |||
04 /
NAKASHIMA, Yoshiaki NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/32] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07849909.2 | 21.11.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007JP72993 | Priority number, date | JP20060314239 | 21.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006314239 | [2009/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008062899 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2085455 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2085455 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C10B29/02, F27D1/04 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
C10B29/02 (EP,KR);
F27D1/04 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/32] | C10B29/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | BACKSTEINSTRUKTUR FÜR EINE KOKSOFENWAND | [2009/32] | English: | COKE OVEN WALL BRICKWORK STRUCTURE | [2009/32] | French: | STRUCTURE EN BRIQUETAGE POUR PAROI DE FOUR À COKE | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2009 | Translation filed | 10.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 24.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2007 | AT | 14.01.2015 | BE | 14.01.2015 | CY | 14.01.2015 | CZ | 14.01.2015 | DK | 14.01.2015 | EE | 14.01.2015 | ES | 14.01.2015 | FI | 14.01.2015 | LT | 14.01.2015 | LV | 14.01.2015 | MC | 14.01.2015 | MT | 14.01.2015 | NL | 14.01.2015 | PL | 14.01.2015 | PT | 14.01.2015 | RO | 14.01.2015 | SE | 14.01.2015 | SI | 14.01.2015 | SK | 14.01.2015 | TR | 14.01.2015 | BG | 14.04.2015 | GR | 15.04.2015 | IS | 14.05.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 21.11.2007 | |
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 14.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH09506909 ; | [A]US1782638 (FRITZ TOTZEK); | [A]JPS5114902 (KRUPP KOPPERS GMBH); | [A]JPS50141601 ; | [A]JP2005307003 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) | by applicant | JP2005307003 |