EP2105481 - TWO-PACKAGE TYPE, AIR-DRYING, VIBRATION-DAMPING COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Tokushu Toryo Co., Ltd. 16-7 Oji 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 114-8584 / JP | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Nihon Tokushu Toryo Co., Ltd. 16-7 Oji 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 114-8584 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states Nihon Tokushu Toryo Co., Ltd. 16-7 Oji 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 114-8584 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKATA, Ayumi C/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
FUNAHASHI, Makoto C/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
KUROYAMA, Yoshinobu C/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
OTOGAWA, Tetsuya C/o Nihon Tokushu Toryo Co. Ltd. 16-7, Oji 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 114-8584 / JP | 05 /
SUZUKI, Hiroshi C/o Nihon Tokushu Toryo Co. Ltd. 16-7, Oji 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 114-8584 / JP | 06 /
DEGUCHI, Kouji C/o Nihon Tokushu Toryo Co. Ltd. 16-7, Oji 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 114-8584 / JP | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/04] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2009/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 07850190.5 | 06.12.2007 | [2009/40] | WO2007JP73581 | Priority number, date | JP20070000390 | 05.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007000390 | [2009/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008081680 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2105481 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09D163/00, C09D5/00, C09D7/12 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
C09D5/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09D163/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09D7/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/40] | Title | German: | ZWEIKOMPONENTIGE, LUFTTROCKNENDE, VIBRATIONSDÄMPFENDE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2009/40] | English: | TWO-PACKAGE TYPE, AIR-DRYING, VIBRATION-DAMPING COATING COMPOSITION | [2009/40] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT DE TYPE DOUBLE EMBALLAGE, SÉCHANT À L'AIR ET AMORTISSANT LES VIBRATIONS | [2009/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2009 | Translation filed | 27.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/40] | 29.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 03.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2015 | 31.12.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6143669 ; | [I]US2003054173 (RUDDY LARRY R [US]) [I] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 13] - [0019] - [0 22] , [0 23] * * paragraphs [0026] , [0 27] , [0 30] , [0 31] , [0 35] * * claims 1-5, 8, 9 *; | [I]EP1500690 (PPG IND OHIO INC [US]) [I] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0015] - [0021] - [0 28] - [0035] * * paragraph [0110]; examples 1-13; table 1 ** claims 1-7, 11, 15 *; | [X] - SATO, H; YAMAZAKI, H.; IWASAKI, T., "Corrosion-proofing paint composition", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1986-098106 [15], XP002160521 & JPS6143669 A 19860303 (IWASAKI TAINETSU KAGAKU; YOKOHAMA RUBBER) [X] 1,3-6 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPS6071671 (TOYOTA TSUUSHIYOU KK); | [X]JPH03290482 (SHOWA ELECTRIC WIRE & CABLE CO); | [X]JP2003019768 (NIPPON TOKUSHU TORYO CO LTD) | by applicant | JPS57139154 | JPS6071671 | JPS6143669 | JPH03290482 | JP3290482B | JP2003019768 | US2003054173 | WO03080746 | EP1500690 |