EP2090805 - POWER TRANSMISSION CHAIN, AND POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIURA, Yoshihisa JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
NAGAOKA, Teruko JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07850291.1 | 07.12.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007JP73713 | Priority number, date | JP20060331289 | 08.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006331289 | JP20060342028 | 20.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006342028 | [2009/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008069319 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2090805 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16G5/18 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
F16G5/18 (EP,US);
F16H9/24 (US);
F16H9/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSKETTE UND KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/34] | English: | POWER TRANSMISSION CHAIN, AND POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE | [2009/34] | French: | CHAÎNE DE TRANSMISSION DE PUISSANCE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE PUISSANCE | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2009 | Translation filed | 03.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 14.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 06.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/50] | Divisional application(s) | EP11004617.4 / EP2365230 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2006097844 (JTEKT CORP) [AD] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2006214508 (JTEKT CORP) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,10,12 * * paragraphs [0060] - [0063] - [0 66] - [0069] - [0 87] *; | [XPL]EP1845286 (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [XP] 1,2 * figures 15,16 * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0157] * [L] ; | [E]EP1944525 (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2* paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0093]; figure 8 * | International search | [A]JP2006097844 (JTEKT CORP); | [A]JP2006170314 (JTEKT CORP); | [X]JP2006214508 (JTEKT CORP) | by applicant | JP2006097844 |