EP2124151 - INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR STARTING/RECOVERING THE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [2012/26] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION New Orchard Road Armonk, New York 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABE, Atsushi Yamato site IBM Japan Ltd. 1623-14, Shimotsuruma Yamato-shi Kanagawa 242-8502 / JP | 02 /
KIMURA, Tomoaki Yamato site IBM Japan Ltd. 1623-14, Shimotsuruma Yamato-shi Kanagawa 242-8502 / JP | [2012/26] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
ABE, Atsushi Yamato site IBM Japan Ltd. 1623-14, Shimotsuruma Yamato-shi Kanagawa 242-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
KIMURA, Tomoaki Yamato site IBM Japan Ltd. 1623-14, Shimotsuruma Yamato-shi Kanagawa 242-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Ling, Christopher John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Ling, Christopher John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [2009/48] | Ling, Christopher John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 07850718.3 | 17.12.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007JP74230 | Priority number, date | JP20060340224 | 18.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006340224 | JP20070198183 | 30.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007198183 | [2009/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008075646 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2124151 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2124151 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/16, G06F9/445, G06F11/16, G06F11/10, G06F11/20 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
G06F11/1417 (EP);
G06F12/16 (KR);
G06F11/08 (KR);
G06F11/167 (EP);
G06F9/4401 (EP);
G06F9/455 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | G06F12/16, G06F9/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM STARTEN/WIEDERHERSTELLEN DES SYSTEMS | [2009/48] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR STARTING/RECOVERING THE SYSTEM | [2009/48] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DES INFORMATIONS POUR LANCER OU RESTAURER LE SYSTÈME | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2009 | Translation filed | 03.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 01.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2007 | AT | 27.06.2012 | BE | 27.06.2012 | CY | 27.06.2012 | CZ | 27.06.2012 | DK | 27.06.2012 | EE | 27.06.2012 | FI | 27.06.2012 | IT | 27.06.2012 | LT | 27.06.2012 | LV | 27.06.2012 | MT | 27.06.2012 | NL | 27.06.2012 | PL | 27.06.2012 | RO | 27.06.2012 | SE | 27.06.2012 | SI | 27.06.2012 | SK | 27.06.2012 | TR | 27.06.2012 | BG | 27.09.2012 | GR | 28.09.2012 | ES | 08.10.2012 | IS | 27.10.2012 | PT | 29.10.2012 | IE | 17.12.2012 | LU | 17.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | FR | 02.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
IE | 17.12.2012 | ||
LU | 17.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
IE | 17.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
IE | 17.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
IE | 17.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
IE | 17.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
IE | 17.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 27.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5835695 (NOLL MICHAEL J [US]) [Y] 1-5,8-11,14 * abstract * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 20 * * column 2, line 30 - line 42 * * column 2, line 66 - column 5, line 8 * * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 31 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 24 * * claims 1-6 * * figures 1,2a,2b *; | [Y]JP2004013719 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 1-5,8-11,14 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0015] - [0018] - [0038] - [0052] * * figure 10 *; | [A]JP2000148467 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-5,8-11,14 * paragraphs [0015] - [0021] - [0036] - [0039] - [0041] - [0045] * * figures 1,3,6,9,11 * | International search | [Y]JP2000148467 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2004013719 (FUJITSU LTD) |