Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8279188 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2012 | B2 | US2010033442 | 11.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007000069 | 04.01.2007 | WO2007JP74292 | 18.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101342731B | Global Dossier | 19.12.2013 | B1 | KR20090107025 | 12.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007000069 | 04.01.2007 | WO2007JP74292 | 18.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5101525B | Global Dossier | 19.12.2012 | B2 | JPWO2008081710 | 30.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007000069 | 04.01.2007 | WO2007JP74292 | 18.12.2007 | JP2008552082 | 18.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2101249 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2016 | B1 | EP2101249 | 02.01.2013 | A4 | EP2101249 | 16.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007000069 | 04.01.2007 | WO2007JP74292 | 18.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0720833 | 04.03.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2007000069 | 04.01.2007 | WO2007JP74292 | 18.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101578572B | 25.01.2012 | B | CN101578572 | 11.11.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007000069 | 04.01.2007 | WO2007JP74292 | 18.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008081710 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007000069 | 04.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI438648B | 21.05.2014 | B | TW200842671 | 01.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007000069 | 04.01.2007 |