EP2124139 - USER INTERFACE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 1-11 Kanda-Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2014/08] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERADA, Tomohiro Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Dev. Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
YAMASHITA, Atsushi Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Dev. Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
HIRAI, Takuya Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Dev. Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
NAKANO, Nobuyuki Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Dev. Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2009/48] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 07850786.0 | 18.12.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007JP74300 | Priority number, date | JP20060345520 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006345520 | [2009/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008078603 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2124139 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F3/041, B60R16/02 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
G06F3/0425 (EP,US);
G06V40/67 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G06V40/107 (EP,US);
G06V40/113 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | G06F3/041, B60R16/02, G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHENEINRICHTUNG | [2009/48] | English: | USER INTERFACE DEVICE | [2009/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2009 | Translation filed | 02.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 04.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IDA]WO2006104132 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [ID] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,3; | [IPA]EP1865404 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [IP] 1 * The subject-matter of this document is assumed to correspond to the subject-matter of WO2006/104132 cited in the International search report.; paragraphs [0006] , [0007] * * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] * * pages 89-92 * * figure 14 *[A] 2,3 | International search | [Y]JP2003300444 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2005254851 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]WO2006104132 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO2006027924 | WO2006104132 |