EP2093600 - LASER SCAN CONFOCAL MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | ||
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Yuki c/o Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 02 /
AIKAWA, Naoshi c/o Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [2012/04] |
Former [2009/35] | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Yuki c/o NIKON CORPORATION 2-3 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | ||
02 /
AIKAWA, Naoshi c/o NIKON CORPORATION 2-3 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07850946.0 | 20.12.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007JP74511 | Priority number, date | JP20060345662 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006345662 | [2009/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008081729 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2093600 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00, G02B26/10 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
G02B21/0048 (EP,US);
G02B21/0032 (US);
G02B21/00 (US);
G02B21/0024 (US);
G02B21/0076 (EP,US);
G02B21/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | KONFOKALES LASER-SCANNING-MIKROSKOP | [2009/35] | English: | LASER SCAN CONFOCAL MICROSCOPE | [2009/35] | French: | MICROSCOPE CONFOCAL À BALAYAGE LASER | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2009 | Translation filed | 27.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 25.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/04] | Divisional application(s) | EP11190282.1 / EP2434325 | EP11190299.5 / EP2434326 | EP11190303.5 / EP2434327 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9852084 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 2 * abstract * * page 2, line 21 - page 4, line 10 ** figures 1-5 *; | [XYI]US2004178356 (NATORI YASUAKI [JP]) [X] 1,5,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010] * * figure 1 * [Y] 2 [I] 4,11-13 | International search | [A]JP2005043892 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS) | by applicant | JP3365884B | JP2005275199 |