EP2098357 - POLYMER FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MGC Filsheet Co., Ltd. 2242 Mikajima 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-1164 / JP | For all designated states Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. Mitsubishi Building 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [2009/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Kenji c/o MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY INC. 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHI, Katsushige c/o MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY INC. 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | 03 /
YOKOYAMA, Jun c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Research Laboratory 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | 04 /
MIURA, Mitsuo c/o MGC Filsheet Co. Ltd. 2242 Mikajima 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-1164 / JP | 05 /
NARA, Tsutomu c/o MGC Filsheet Co. Ltd. 2242 Mikajima 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-1164 / JP | [2012/23] |
Former [2009/37] | 01 /
KATO, Kenji c/o MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY INC. 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | ||
02 /
HAYASHI, Katsushige c/o MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY INC. 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | |||
03 /
YOKOYAMA, Jun c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Research Laboratory 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | |||
04 /
MIURA, Mitsuo c/o MGC Filsheet Co. Ltd. 2242 Mikajima 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-1164 / JP | |||
05 /
NARA, Tsutomu c/o MGC Filsheet Co. Ltd. 2242 Mikajima 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-1164 / JP | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2009/37] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07851131.8 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007JP75337 | Priority number, date | JP20060354246 | 28.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006354246 | [2009/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008081953 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2098357 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2098357 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C59/04, C08J5/18, G02B1/11, G02F1/13357, B29K69/00, B29L11/00 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
B29C59/04 (EP,KR,US);
G02B1/11 (KR);
G02B5/0221 (EP,US);
G02B5/0278 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | POLYMERFOLIE | [2009/37] | English: | POLYMER FILM | [2009/37] | French: | FILM POLYMÈRE | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2009 | Translation filed | 06.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 24.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2007 | AT | 06.06.2012 | BE | 06.06.2012 | CY | 06.06.2012 | CZ | 06.06.2012 | DK | 06.06.2012 | EE | 06.06.2012 | FI | 06.06.2012 | IT | 06.06.2012 | LT | 06.06.2012 | LV | 06.06.2012 | MT | 06.06.2012 | NL | 06.06.2012 | PL | 06.06.2012 | RO | 06.06.2012 | SE | 06.06.2012 | SI | 06.06.2012 | SK | 06.06.2012 | TR | 06.06.2012 | BG | 06.09.2012 | GR | 07.09.2012 | ES | 17.09.2012 | IS | 06.10.2012 | PT | 08.10.2012 | IE | 21.12.2012 | LU | 21.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
MT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
TR | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
LU | 21.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
MT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
TR | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
MT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 06.06.2012 | |
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 06.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2008052663 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [E] 1-5 * example 1; claims 1-17 *; | [PX]WO2007045380 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-5 * examples 1-7; claims 1-9 *; | [PX]WO2007044063 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR], et al) [PX] 1-5 * examples 1-5; claims 1-14 *; | [X]WO2006082797 ; | [X]EP1170323 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-5 * examples 1-6; claims 1-45 *; | [X]EP1013702 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [X] 1-5 * examples 1-3; claims 1-15 *; | [X]EP0418051 (POLYPLASTICS CO [JP]) [X] 1-5 * examples 1-7; claims 1-10 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 57, Database accession no. 2006-559913, XP002564711 & WO2006082797 A 20060810 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM CO INC) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2002241514 (DAIYA PLASTIC KK); | [X]JP2003107215 (KEIWA INC); | [Y]JP2002221612 (TAKIRON CO); | [A]JP2004155101 (KEIWA INC) | by applicant | JPH01337711C | JP2003107214 | JPH11337711 | JP2002357706 | JP2002202508 | JP2003329812 | JP2004004417 |