EP2101891 - MAGNET AND PIN FOR BLOCK TOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kim, Dong Wan 111-1303 Hwaseong Baran Urim Pilu Apt. Baran-ri Hyangnam-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-923 / KR | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Young Pil Kwang-A B/D, 629-2,Yeoksam-dong Gangnam-gu, Seoul 135-080 / KR | [2009/49] |
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
KIM, Young Pil Seryu-dong Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 441-110 / KR | Representative(s) | Riemann, Jörg Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Riemann, Jörg ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07851243.1 | 04.12.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007KR06252 | Priority number, date | KR20060030932U | 04.12.2006 Original published format: KR 20060030932 U | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008069549 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2101891 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/06 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
A63H33/046 (EP,KR,US);
A63H33/06 (EP,US);
A63H33/088 (KR);
A63H33/26 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/39] | A63H33/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | MAGNET UND STIFT FÜR BAUSTEINSPIELZEUG | [2009/39] | English: | MAGNET AND PIN FOR BLOCK TOY | [2009/39] | French: | AIMANT ET GOUPILLE POUR JEU DE CONSTRUCTION | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 08.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/01] | 16.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2795893 (VAYO HAROLD E) [A] 1 * figures 1-4; claims 1,2 *; | [A]JPH08173642 (BANDAI CO) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2004116038 (HUNTS LARRY DEAN [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]KR200399428Y ; | [A]JPH08257252 (SUTATSUFU KK); | [A]KR20040065186 (ORDA KOREA CO LTD) |