EP2126183 - WASHING/DRYING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IM, Myong-Hun 327-23, Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-023 / KR | 02 /
CHANG, Jin-Ho 327-23, Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-023 / KR | 03 /
WOO, Kyung-Chul 327-23, Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-023 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Kyeong-Hwan 327-23, Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-023 / KR | [2012/29] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
IM, Myong-Hun 327-23, Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-023 / KR | ||
02 /
CHANG, Jin-Ho 327-23, Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-023 / KR | |||
03 /
WOO, Kyung-Chul 327-23, Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-023 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Kyeong-Hwan 327-23, Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-023 / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07851401.5 | 11.12.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007KR06430 | Priority number, date | KR20060125874 | 11.12.2006 Original published format: KR 20060125874 | KR20060125875 | 11.12.2006 Original published format: KR 20060125875 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008072876 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2126183 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2126183 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/00, D06F58/20 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
D06F39/40 (EP,US);
D06F58/203 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/49] | D06F39/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | WASCHTROCKNER | [2009/49] | English: | WASHING/DRYING MACHINE | [2009/49] | French: | MACHINE À LAVER/À ESSORER | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 26.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2007 | AT | 18.07.2012 | BE | 18.07.2012 | CY | 18.07.2012 | CZ | 18.07.2012 | DK | 18.07.2012 | EE | 18.07.2012 | FI | 18.07.2012 | IT | 18.07.2012 | LT | 18.07.2012 | LV | 18.07.2012 | MT | 18.07.2012 | NL | 18.07.2012 | PL | 18.07.2012 | RO | 18.07.2012 | SE | 18.07.2012 | SI | 18.07.2012 | SK | 18.07.2012 | TR | 18.07.2012 | BG | 18.10.2012 | GR | 19.10.2012 | ES | 29.10.2012 | IS | 18.11.2012 | PT | 19.11.2012 | IE | 11.12.2012 | LU | 11.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
TR | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
LU | 11.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
TR | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2873539 (MOREY EVERETT D) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [XI]GB2231944 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * page 11, lines 3-10; figures 3-5,8,10 * [I] 6-15; | [A]US5305484 (FITZPATRICK JOHN S [IE], et al) [A] 8-10 * column 15, line 60 - line 64; figures 1,5 *; | [A]JPH1075997 (SEKISUI PLASTICS) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1146161 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1,8-10 * paragraph [0021] *; | [A]WO2004046448 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 7* page 12, columns 21-26 *; | [XP]GB2427397 (SLADE BRIAN PARRY [GB]) [XP] 1-3,6 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH08215488 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JPH08215489 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]KR20020022478 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]KR20020062451 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [X]JP2004350840 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al); | [X]KR20060105325 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) |