EP2121381 - VEHICLE SYSTEM, AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast -Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | ||
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie Voor Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOSTER, Darrel, Leigh Groenhovenweg 417 NL-2803 DK Gouda / NL | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2009/48] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07851940.2 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007NL50680 | Priority number, date | EP20060077313 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: EP 06077313 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008079002 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2121381 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2121381 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60P3/20, B60W40/06, B60W20/00, B60W10/30, B60W10/26, B60W30/18 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
B60L1/003 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP,KR);
B60W20/10 (US);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60L50/51 (EP,US);
B60L58/26 (EP,US);
B60L7/14 (EP,US);
B60P3/20 (EP,KR,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/30 (EP,KR,US);
B60W30/18127 (EP,US);
B60L2200/26 (EP,US);
B60L2240/36 (EP,US);
B60L2240/62 (EP,US);
B60L2250/10 (EP,US);
B60L2260/56 (EP,US);
B60W2552/20 (EP,US);
B60W2556/50 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | B60P3/20, B60W40/06, B60W20/00, B60W10/30, B60W10/26, B60W30/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2009/48] | English: | VEHICLE SYSTEM, AND METHOD | [2009/48] | French: | SYSTÈME DE VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 06.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12167843.7 / EP2578450 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2007 | AT | 20.06.2012 | BE | 20.06.2012 | CY | 20.06.2012 | CZ | 20.06.2012 | DK | 20.06.2012 | EE | 20.06.2012 | FI | 20.06.2012 | IT | 20.06.2012 | LT | 20.06.2012 | LV | 20.06.2012 | MT | 20.06.2012 | PL | 20.06.2012 | RO | 20.06.2012 | SI | 20.06.2012 | SK | 20.06.2012 | TR | 20.06.2012 | BG | 20.09.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | IS | 20.10.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | IE | 21.12.2012 | LU | 21.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
LU | 21.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 20.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2004168449 (HOMAN TOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-11,14,15,17-19,21,24,25,27,28 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13,16,18; | [XY]US6073456 (KAWAI TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,14,15,18,19,24,25,27,28 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13,16-18; | [XY]DE4123843 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,18,19,21,24-28 * the whole document * [Y] 3-10,14,15,18,20,21; | [Y]DE20207534U (TRS TRANSPORTKOELING B V [NL]) [Y] 21 * the whole document *; | [PY]EP1790921 (CUMMINS GENERATOR TECHNOLOGIES [GB]) [PY] 18,21 * the whole document *; | [Y]CA2457216 (LECLERC GAETAN [CA]) [Y] 3,4,10,20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005007444 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 22,23 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 22 * * page 3, line 20 - line 27 * * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 11 * * page 15, line 25 - line 33 * * page 26, line 6 - line 17 * * page 37, line 3 - line 16 *; | [A]EP1256476 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [A] 22,23 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0091] *; | [A]US6314347 (KURODA KOUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 22,23 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 19 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 12 *; | [Y]US2004124703 (TANI KEISUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 3,4,9,10,14,15,17 * paragraphs [0064] - [0149]; figures 1-17 * | [Y] - YAMAGUCHI K ET AL, "DUAL SYSTEM - NEEWLY DEVELOPED HYBRID SYSTEM", EVS - 13. 13TH. INTERNATIONAL ELECTRIC VEHICLE SYMPOSIUM. OSAKA, OCT. 13 - 16, 1996. SESSIONS 1A - 4H, EVS. INTERNATIONAL ELECTRIC VEHICLE SYMPOSIUM, TOKYO, JEVA, JP, (19961013), VOL. 1 SYMP. 13, pages 603 - 610, XP000687926 [Y] 3-10,14,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE20207534U | DE4123843 |