Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2117399
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.11.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
05.07.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.01.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.05.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] |
06.01.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
06.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.12.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.10.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] |
16.10.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] |
02.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.09.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|