EP2117399 - A SINGLE-USE TOILET IN THE FORM OF A BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peepoople AB Alsnögatan 3 11641 Stockholm / SE | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILHELMSON, Anders Strandpromenaden 25D S-13150 Saltsjö-duvnäs / SE | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Örtenblad, Bertil Tore, et al Noréns Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 10198 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Örtenblad, Bertil Tore, et al Noréns Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 10198 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07852186.1 | 28.11.2007 | [2009/47] | WO2007SE50914 | Priority number, date | SE20070000511 | 01.03.2007 Original published format: SE 0700511 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008105702 | Date: | 04.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117399 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47K11/03, A47K11/00, A47K11/02 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
A47K11/02 (EP,KR,SE,US);
A47K11/00 (SE);
A47K11/035 (KR);
A47K11/03 (SE);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | TOILETTE FÜR DEN EINMALIGEN GEBRAUCH IN FORM EINES BEUTELS | [2009/47] | English: | A SINGLE-USE TOILET IN THE FORM OF A BAG | [2009/47] | French: | TOILETTE JETABLE SOUS LA FORME D'UN SAC | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 01.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 06.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2009 | 30.11.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB883069 (BOWATER RES & DEV CO LTD); | [A]US3772712 (RENN C, et al); | [A]US4938748 (YUM SU I [US], et al) |