Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8571852 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2013 | B2 | US2010063801 | 11.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89263807 | 02.03.2007 | WO2007SE50999 | 14.12.2007 | US52965207 | 14.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5255575B | Global Dossier | 07.08.2013 | B2 | JP2010520504 | 10.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US89263807 | 02.03.2007 | WO2007SE50999 | 14.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2132732 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2012 | B1 | EP2132732 | 15.12.2010 | A4 | EP2132732 | 16.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89263807 | 02.03.2007 | WO2007SE50999 | 14.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE548727T | 15.03.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US89263807 | 02.03.2007 | WO2007SE50999 | 14.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101622667B | 15.08.2012 | B | CN101622667 | 06.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US89263807 | 02.03.2007 | WO2007SE50999 | 14.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008108701 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89263807 | 02.03.2007 |