Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009078759 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007SE51002 | 14.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8934519 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2015 | B2 | US2010265994 | 21.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007SE51002 | 14.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2220785 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2014 | A4 | EP2220785 | 25.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007SE51002 | 14.12.2007 |