EP2220785 - RAKE OR G-RAKE RECEIVER STRUCTURE FOR DOWNLINK TRANSMIT DIVERSITY SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIAO, Qingyu room 2-302 building 611 Bei Yuan Jia Yuan Moli Yuan Chao yang District Beijing Chao Yang District 100012 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Hai Room 1211 Building 1, Yard1 Jiao Tong Da Xue Road Haidian District Beijing, Haidian District 100044 / CN | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07852273.7 | 14.12.2007 | [2010/34] | WO2007SE51002 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009078759 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2220785 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04L1/06, H04B1/7115, H04B7/08 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
H04B1/7115 (EP,US);
H04B7/0848 (EP,US);
H04B7/0894 (EP,US);
H04L1/0631 (EP,US);
H04B7/0669 (EP,US);
H04L1/0668 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/34] | H04B7/06, H04L1/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | RAKE- ODER G-RAKE-EMPFÄNGERSTRUKTUR FÜR SIGNALE MIT ABWÄRTSSTRECKENSENDEDIVERSITÄT | [2010/34] | English: | RAKE OR G-RAKE RECEIVER STRUCTURE FOR DOWNLINK TRANSMIT DIVERSITY SIGNALS | [2010/34] | French: | STRUCTURE DE RÉCEPTEUR EN RÂTEAU OU EN RÂTEAU GÉNÉRALISÉ POUR SIGNAUX À DIVERSITÉ D'ÉMISSION DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE | [2010/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/34] | 02.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/16] | 05.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2001033614 (HUDSON JOHN E [GB]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * paragraph [0068]; figure 4 * [I] 3,4,8,9; | [XI]WO0221729 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,5,6,10 * page 20, line 19 - page 21, line 13 * [I] 2-4,7-9; | [XI]US2005069023 (BOTTOMLEY GREGORY E [US] ET AL) [X] 1,5,6,10 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0104] * [I] 2-4,7-9 | International search | [X]US2006229051 ; | [A] - ALAMOUTI S.M., "A simple transmit diversity technique for wireless communications", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, (199810), vol. 16, no. 8, pages 1451 - 1458, XP011054845 | [A] - AN J.F., "Performance analysis of orthogonal transmit diversity over Intra-Cell interference in WCDMA downlinks", 16TH IST MOBILE AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SUMMIT, (20070701), pages 1 - 6, XP031132365 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISTMWC.2007.4299192 | [A] - BOTTOMLEY G.E. ET AL, "A generalized RAKE receiver for interference suppression", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, (200008), vol. 18, no. 8, pages 1536 - 1545, XP011055176 |