EP2106508 - PAD SHIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bendix Spicer Foundation Brake LLC 901 Cleveland Avenue Elyria, OH 44035 / US | [2009/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KROMER, Mark J. 526 Snowy Egret Dr. Huron, OH 44839 / US | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 07852897.3 | 24.10.2007 | [2009/41] | WO2007US22482 | Priority number, date | US20060599490 | 15.11.2006 Original published format: US 599490 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008060392 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2106508 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/00, F16D65/12 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
F16D65/00 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0037 (EP,US);
F16D2065/1348 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/41] | Title | German: | BELAGSCHUTZ | [2009/41] | English: | PAD SHIELD | [2009/41] | French: | PROTECTION DE PLAQUETTE | [2009/41] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/41] | 08.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/15] | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/15] | Request for further processing for: | 10.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 10.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 10.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 10.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 10.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 10.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 10.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 10.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 10.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 10.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3625316 (MORI YOSHINORI) [X] 1-14 * column 2, line 15 - line 53 *; | [A]WO2004046577 (SCANIA CV ABP [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]JPH04125325 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US3298469 (ROBINETTE RICHARD T) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 70 - column 3, line 30; figure - * | International search | [X]US3625316 (MORI YOSHINORI) [X] 1-24 * , figure 4 *; | [A]US3937304 (BRIX HERMANN) [A] 1-24 * , figure 4 *; | [A]US4039054 (RATH HEINRICH BERNHARD) [A] 1-24 * , figure 1 * |